Financial history ADVICE ON INDIVIDUAL RIGHTS IN EUROPE (THE AIRE CENTRE)

Charity number: 1090336
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £751.36k £873.42k £1.30m £1.54m £1.47m
Total expenditure £809.89k £850.28k £1.19m £1.30m £1.47m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £373.44k £528.00k £1.04m £1.17m £1.36m
Income - Donations and legacies £83.67k £186.12k £198.93k £182.79k £68.80k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £667.66k £687.24k £1.11m £1.36m £1.40m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £33 £61 £185 £163 £49
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £774.46k £818.74k £1.15m £1.26m £1.43m
Expenditure - Raising funds £35.43k £31.54k £37.13k £39.65k £39.35k
Expenditure - Governance £6.24k £7.39k £6.55k £10.32k £6.89k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0