Trustees THE SCAYNES HILL VILLAGE CENTRE TRUST
Charity number: 1069703
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stephen MINTER FMCA | Chair | 21 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
Esther Rose Featherstone | Trustee | 24 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Cynthia Vallance | Trustee | 20 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Diana Pafford | Trustee | 05 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Santiago Carlos Gil | Trustee | 24 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Angela Grindrod | Trustee | 18 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Peter Froggatt | Trustee | 18 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jillian Packham | Trustee | 18 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Peter Mahon | Trustee | 05 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Naomi Maxted Brennan | Trustee | 19 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Louise Hawes | Trustee | 23 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Cook | Trustee | 30 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
Geoffrey Crosta | Trustee | 17 January 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.