SUTTON MENTAL HEALTH FOUNDATION CHARITY COMPANY

Charity number: 1069945
Charity reporting is up to date (3 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £260.59k £206.93k £213.34k £201.22k £240.03k
Total expenditure £283.51k £237.45k £189.55k £203.22k £210.49k
Income from government contracts £223.39k £180.47k £76.00k £173.24k £240.03k
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A