BREAKTHROUGH (DEAF-HEARING INTEGRATION)

Charity number: 1073468
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £960.07k £1.04m £964.59k £939.15k £1.02m
Total expenditure £724.57k £948.10k £1.07m £1.01m £1.05m
Income from government contracts £141.27k £740.61k N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £590.95k £0 £770.03k £622.38k £636.92k
Income - Donations and legacies £67.70k £113.68k £62.82k £10.71k £44.47k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £755.43k £917.37k £900.10k £924.46k £968.38k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £4.11k £4.60k £1.67k £3.98k £2.88k
Income - Other £132.83k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £113.68k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £720.72k £866.74k £991.77k £963.65k £1.03m
Expenditure - Raising funds £3.85k £81.36k £76.14k £41.39k £21.83k
Expenditure - Governance £16.19k £26.02k £0 £0 £33.45k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0