NATIONS IN BLOOM

Charity number: 1071430
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2020 25 June 2021 117 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2019 12 April 2021 408 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 28 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 April 2018 12 April 2021 774 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2018 06 September 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 April 2017 12 April 2021 1139 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2017 18 May 2017 On time Download
Annual return 30 April 2016 23 June 2017 115 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2016 16 September 2016 On time Download