AGE UK MID DEVON

Charity number: 1070792
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £236.22k £244.40k £282.86k £258.08k £250.02k
Total expenditure £294.63k £257.07k £292.23k £334.74k £285.50k
Income from government contracts £37.57k £45.64k £38.06k £22.68k £17.76k
Income from government grants £59.31k £57.96k £60.53k £60.53k £60.53k