Financial history PHILIP AND GRANVILLE CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1074547
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/03/2018 05/03/2019 05/03/2020 05/03/2021 05/03/2022
Total gross income £17.92k £18.44k £15.81k £6.60k £7.78k
Total expenditure £18.63k £18.62k £16.51k £14.01k £4.59k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A