Financial history SHROPSHIRE ME GROUP

Charity number: 1072171
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2017 30/04/2018 30/04/2019 30/04/2020 30/04/2021
Total gross income £2.85k £5.37k £9.99k £16.49k £16.04k
Total expenditure £3.88k £5.15k £11.19k £12.61k £10.29k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £200 £500