Accounts and annual returns THE VICTOR JARA FOUNDATION, UK

Charity number: 1071355
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2021 Overdue Overdue by 120 days
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 Overdue Overdue by 120 days
Annual return 30 April 2020 Overdue Overdue by 485 days
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 Overdue Overdue by 485 days
Annual return 30 April 2019 Overdue Overdue by 850 days
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 Overdue Overdue by 850 days
Annual return 30 April 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1216 days
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1216 days
Annual return 30 April 2017 24 July 2018 146 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2017 Not Required