Trustees GURU NANAK DURBAR (SIKH TEMPLE), ERITH & BELVEDERE, KENT
Charity number: 1070449
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Piara Singh Atwal | Chair | 09 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
HARBHAJAN SINGH THIARA HOLDING | Trustee | 29 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
AMRIK SINGH GHUMAN HOLDING | Trustee | 29 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
GURCHARAN SINGH DHESI HOLDING | Trustee | 29 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
KULDIP SINGH SADHRA | Trustee | 26 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
RANJIT SINGH AUJLA | Trustee | 26 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
PARMJIT SINGH UPPAL | Trustee | 26 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
SUCHA SINGH THIND | Trustee | 20 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
BALBIR SINGH JOHAL | Trustee | 20 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
SHAMSHER SINGH RAI | Trustee | 20 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
HARJINDER SINGH MALHI | Trustee | 20 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
AVTAR SINGH ATWAL HOLDING | Trustee | 03 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
BAKHSHISH SINGH Tumber | Trustee | 09 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Ramji Dass | Trustee | 09 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Surinder Chahal | Trustee | 09 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Kashmir Singh Atwal | Trustee | 09 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Baljnder Singh Aujla | Trustee | 09 September 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.