Governing document LYME REGIS DEVELOPMENT TRUST
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 29/01/1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 07/05/1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 08/09/2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 23/09/2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27/09/2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 08/07/2013
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE GENERAL CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY OF LYME REGIS AND THE SURROUNDING AREA, AND TO PROVIDE RELIEF FROM POVERTY AND DISADVANTAGE AND TO ADVANCE EDUCATION OF ITS RESIDENTS OF ALL AGES; AND IN PARTICULAR TO PROVIDE OPPORTUNITIES FOR THE AFOREMENTIONED RESIDENTS TO PARTICIPATE FULLY IN THE LIFE OF THEIR COMMUNITY IN WAYS IN WHICH ADDRESS AND ALLEVIATE SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC DEPRIVATION.
Area of benefit
LYME REGIS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.