Financial history THE ROTARY CLUB OF RUGBY DUNSMORE TRUST FUND

Charity number: 1070897
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021
Total gross income £14.33k £12.52k £11.04k £4.15k £7.36k
Total expenditure £11.99k £10.97k £20.36k £7.26k £11.64k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A