Trustees THE BRITISH ORTHODONTIC SOCIETY
Charity number: 1073464
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter Mossey Professor | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Matthew John Clover Dr | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Simon Littlewood | Trustee | 13 May 1969 |
|
|
||||
Guy Deeming Dr | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Chadwick Dr | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Professor Grant Thomson McIntyre | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Nikki Brighton | Trustee | 19 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sally Walker | Trustee | 01 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Anjli Patel | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Trevor Hodge | Trustee | 31 May 1971 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.