Trustees ADVENTIST DEVELOPMENT AND RELIEF AGENCY - UK
Charity number: 1074937
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Pastor Eglan Brooks | Chair | 09 December 2021 |
|
|||||
Gordon James Saggers | Trustee | 23 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Wederly Aguiar | Trustee | 21 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
DR Helen Rodd | Trustee | 14 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW BAILDAM FRCS | Trustee | 14 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Snowdon Reid | Trustee | 14 June 2018 |
|
|||||
John Surridge | Trustee | 12 September 2016 |
|
|||||
JENNIFER PHILLIPS | Trustee | 04 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
TRISTAN SIMMONS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DR STEPHEN LOGAN | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.