AYOT ST. LAWRENCE OLD CHURCH PRESERVATION TRUST

Charity number: 1071016
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £1.73k £1.51k £934 £997 £911
Total expenditure £1.36k £1.74k £1.46k £1.15k £1.50k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A