Trustees THE BACK-UP TRUST
Charity number: 1072216
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LOUISE CLAIRE JOLLIFFE | Trustee | 26 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paul John Fairhurst | Trustee | 27 July 2022 |
|
|||||
Grace Jessie Spence Green | Trustee | 04 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gordon James Craig | Trustee | 04 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Richard John Rawstron | Trustee | 03 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin David Parker | Trustee | 03 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Roberts | Trustee | 24 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Clare Arnold | Trustee | 26 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
HELEN COOKE | Trustee | 21 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
MRS JO WRIGHT | Trustee | 21 July 2016 |
|
|||||
ANNE LUTTMAN-JOHNSON | Trustee | 21 July 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.