Trustees GUILDFORD HARD OF HEARING SUPPORT GROUP
Charity number: 1073489
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Celia Woodward | Chair | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Colin Callegari | Trustee | 11 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Jane Richardson | Trustee | 13 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Vanessa Jane McClure | Trustee | 15 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Martin Digby | Trustee | 09 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
DOREEN SHAW | Trustee | 17 March 2011 |
|
|
||||
KAY MURRAY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Julian Nelson Knowles | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.