CHILDREN CHANGE COLOMBIA

Charity number: 1075037
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £725.22k £689.69k £760.28k £484.42k £493.71k
Total expenditure £657.16k £733.60k £837.53k £536.38k £468.08k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £674.09k £641.69k £704.93k N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £50.54k £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £0 £46.70k £55.32k N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Investment £584 £1.30k £22 N/A N/A
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £71.36k £44.73k £26.30k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £523.73k £617.43k £691.34k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £116.17k £146.19k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £13.78k £20.96k £27.73k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A