Trustees THOMAS DICKANSON
Charity number: 1072083
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BARBARA GRIFFIN MBE | Chair | 05 November 2013 |
|
|||||||||
Councillor Karen Margaret Garrido | Trustee | 17 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Mary-Liz Walker JP, DL | Trustee | 10 February 2023 |
|
|||||||||
Councillor John Mullen | Trustee | 20 July 2022 |
|
|||||||||
PETER MARTIN MCNAMARA | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
|||||||||
GRAHAM GEORGE CURTIS | Trustee | 08 May 2016 |
|
|||||||||
CITY MAYOR PAUL ANTHONY DENNETT | Trustee | 06 May 2016 |
|
|||||||||
CHRISTOPHER WELLS DUNIV | Trustee | 24 October 2012 |
|
|
||||||||
CLLR DAVID LANCASTER MBE | Trustee |
|
||||||||||
JOHN CHRISTENSEN WILLIS CBE | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.