Trustees LOVEL END NURSERY
Charity number: 1072991
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JENNIE HACKETT | Chair | 02 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
JANET SURMAN | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Emily Roberts | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Roxanne Jahansouz | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Daniela Bennett | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Emma Burge | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Green | Trustee | 29 April 2021 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.