Financial history WINSCOMBE AND SANDFORD MILLENNIUM GREEN TRUST

Charity number: 1072279
Charity reporting is overdue by 147 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/11/2017 30/11/2018 30/11/2019 30/11/2020 30/11/2021
Total gross income £1.52k £2.25k £2.78k £947 £9.42k
Total expenditure £3.13k £3.28k £1.93k £1.53k £1.08k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A