Accounts and annual returns ABERYSTWYTH MINI MINORS

Charity number: 1073200
Charity reporting is overdue by 80 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2023 Overdue Overdue by 80 days
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2023 Overdue Overdue by 80 days
Annual return 31 May 2022 22 October 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2021 19 April 2022 19 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2020 30 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2019 30 March 2021 364 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 Not Required