Trustees HAEMATOLOGY AND TRANSPLANT SUPPORT (HATS)
Charity number: 1074484
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANGELA LEATHER | Chair | 07 December 2007 |
|
|
||||
PETER THREADER | Trustee | 23 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Clout | Trustee | 28 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
BEVERLEY JONES | Trustee | 08 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
Dr JACQUI STRINGER | Trustee | 16 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
RITA ANGELICA | Trustee | 28 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
GILLIAN EVANS | Trustee | 19 March 2007 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.