SAINT EDWARD'S MUSIC SOCIETY

Charity number: 1073845
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £4.30k £5.55k £4.76k £9.24k £3.01k
Total expenditure £2.94k £5.55k £4.49k £9.06k £2.44k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A