Governing document NORTH COUNTRY LEISURE
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 14 DECEMBER 1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 11 MARCH 2003 AND 31 MARCH 2006, AND AS AMENDED ON 21 APRIL 2009 & 28 MAY 2009, AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION DATED 1 APRIL 2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 26/03/2015
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS FOR WHICH THE COMPANY IS ESTABLISHED ARE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN THE COUNTIES OF NORTHUMBERLAND, CUMBRIA, TYNE & WEAR, DURHAM AND YORKSHIRE (THE "AREA") AND TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE GOOD PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF PERSONS LIVING IN OR VISITING THE AREA AND IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING) BY:- 3.1 PROMOTING, MAINTAINING AND IMPROVING ACCESS TO SUITABLE SERVICES, ACTIVITIES AND FACILITIES; AND 3.2 BRINGING TOGETHER AND CO-ORDINATING THE EFFORTS OF PERSONS (WHETHER CORPORATE OR OTHERWISE) CONCERNED OR INTERESTED IN THE ATTAINMENT OF ALL OR ANY OF THE COMPANY'S OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
NORTHUMBERLAND, CUMBRIA, TYNE & WEAR AND DURHAM.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.