AQUABATS SPORTS AND SOCIAL CLUB FOR VISUALLY IMPAIRED PEOPLE

Charity number: 1076921
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/10/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £835 £666 £214 £596 £514
Total expenditure £680 £875 £507 £1.24k £1.37k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A