Trustees AUDIO DESCRIPTION ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 1084230
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Patricia Clair Hodson | Trustee | 26 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Cara Sian Edney | Trustee | 26 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rosalyn Carol Chalmers | Trustee | 26 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Oskar White | Trustee | 26 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Karen Limper-Herz | Trustee | 25 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew James Sharp | Trustee | 27 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Veronika Hyks | Trustee | 27 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Edward Ellis Copisarow | Trustee | 28 September 2021 |
|
|||||
Jennifer Elbourne | Trustee | 29 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Carolyn Anne Smith | Trustee | 25 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
TIMOTHY JAMES CALVERT | Trustee | 26 September 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.