FREE BELIEVERS IN CHRIST FELLOWSHIP TRUST

Charity number: 1073806
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £173.59k £188.00k £187.11k £248.80k £252.06k
Total expenditure £164.58k £169.25k £172.90k £169.51k £163.26k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A