Financial history BEDLINOG AND TRELEWIS GOING FOR GREEN GROUP

Charity number: 1075065
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 28/02/2017 28/02/2018 28/02/2019 29/02/2020 28/02/2021
Total gross income £2.44k £10 £120 £2.58k £2.48k
Total expenditure £0 £0 £40 £0 £100
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A