ACTS ONE EIGHT TRUST

Charity number: 1076989
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £2.08k £1.85k £1.95k £2.59k £2.31k
Total expenditure £3.91k £2.31k £2.59k £3.91k £3.68k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A