Trustees KNUTSFORD HERITAGE CENTRE

Charity number: 1076917
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
CHRISTOPHER GORDON HENRETTY Chair 16 January 2014
CHURCH WOOD CONSERVATION GROUP
Overdue by 449 days
MRS D M FRANCE-HAYHURST CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
JOHN HOLFORD'S CHARITY
Received: On time
Vivien Langford Hainsworth Trustee 14 June 2018
None on record
Janet McCappin Trustee 14 June 2018
None on record
Janet Anne Nicholson Trustee 24 May 2018
None on record
Rick Dallimore Trustee 01 September 2017
EGERTON YOUTH CLUB
Received: 20 days late
CHARITY OF MARJORIE HURST
Received: On time
Dr SIMON JOHN HARRIS BA PhD Trustee 11 November 2013
THE RANULF HIGDEN SOCIETY
Received: On time
THE CHETHAM SOCIETY FOR THE PUBLICATION OF REMAINS HISTORICAL AND LITERARY CONNECTED WITH THE PALATINE COUNTIES OF LANCASTER AND CHESTER
Received: On time
Valerie Elaine Bryant Trustee 11 November 2013
None on record