Trustees SCHOOLS CHRISTIAN WORKER PROJECT
Charity number: 1076894
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Leonora Abigail Green | Trustee | 20 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stephanie Louise Barkley | Trustee | 20 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
ALISTAIR NURDEN | Trustee | 14 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Lydia Cranston | Trustee | 22 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rev ANDREW CRANSTON | Trustee | 15 June 2015 |
|
|||||
JENNIFER BEVINGTON | Trustee | 12 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN DIGBY | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.