Trustees THE FRIENDS OF PARKFIELD MEDICAL CENTRE PATIENTS PARTICIPATION GROUP
Charity number: 1075710
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JANICE ELIZABETH NEAL MBA | Chair | 14 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
Tim Sims JP | Trustee | 27 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Emily Clayton | Trustee | 27 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Donna Steward | Trustee | 27 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Rushikesh Trivedi MRCGP | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andree Sheehan-Evett | Trustee | 29 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Joan Williams | Trustee | 29 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Marcia Brimson | Trustee | 29 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
ANDREE EVANS | Trustee | 14 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT ANTHONY HILLYARD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS M PATTMAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BERYL ELDERFIELD | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.