Trustees SPIRITUAL ASSEMBLY OF THE BAHA'IS OF ALTRINCHAM AND SALE
Charity number: 1073375
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SIAMACK SHAHRIARI-ZAVAREH | Trustee | 08 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anisa Youssefi Taleb | Trustee | 21 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Bahar Rowshanabady | Trustee | 28 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Alhan Tayefi Nasrabadi | Trustee | 21 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Naghmeh JABERI KHORMOOJI | Trustee | 20 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
SOBHAN SOROURIAN | Trustee | 21 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
Saman Sabeti | Trustee | 21 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
NADIA TALEB | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr MONA Sabeti | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.