Trustees SOUTH WEST NOTTINGHAMSHIRE DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL
Charity number: 1073964
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor Stanley Heptinstall | Chair | 11 June 2015 |
|
|||||
Connor Michael Lynch | Trustee | 14 December 2023 |
|
|||||
Deborah Anne Storer | Trustee | 13 July 2023 |
|
|||||
Edward Hewes | Trustee | 26 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Adam Matthew Blakey | Trustee | 08 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Annette Marie Daykin | Trustee | 19 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Christopher James Phillips | Trustee | 29 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Jane Andrews | Trustee | 29 June 2017 |
|
|||||
DAVID RONALD PIDGEON | Trustee | 12 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
TIMOTHY JAMES ORTON | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.