BAUGHURST RIDING FOR THE DISABLED ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1073644
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £1.38k £650 £5.36k £3 £450
Total expenditure £1.22k £1.40k £1.39k £1.39k £500
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A