Trustees ROSSINGTON HALL GROUP DONCASTER RIDING FOR THE DISABLED
Charity number: 1074139
Charity reporting is up to date (2 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rachel Shaw | Chair | 14 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Allison Richards | Trustee | 21 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Racheal Harrison | Trustee | 21 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sara Clayton | Trustee | 15 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Greenaway | Trustee | 14 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Craig Martin Greenaway | Trustee | 14 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jean Edge | Trustee | 18 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Kate Stainthorpe | Trustee | 11 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
ANN JONES | Trustee | 01 November 1999 |
|
|
||||
MARY SHELDON | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.