Trustees YARE VALLEY GROUP RIDING FOR THE DISABLED ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 1074258
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOANNE EBBAGE | Chair | 10 December 2011 |
|
|
||||
Helen Brown Mrs | Trustee | 25 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Mary Cooke Mrs | Trustee | 25 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alison Mary Cotterill | Trustee | 23 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Josephine Anne Pinnington | Trustee | 21 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Helen Elizabeth Southgate | Trustee | 11 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dominique Caroline Earl | Trustee | 11 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Karen Nunn | Trustee | 27 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
JOY LEWIS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ALISON DAWN NICE | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.