Financial history 3GS DEVELOPMENT TRUST

Charity number: 1100265
Charity reporting is overdue by 5 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £686.76k £512.49k £162.27k £162.27k £131.00k
Total expenditure £720.39k £450.85k £182.85k £182.85k £510.00k
Income from government contracts £560.58k £402.87k £101.25k N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £16.00k
Income - Donations and legacies £12.35k £5.13k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £66.09k £35.49k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £598.03k £471.86k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment £36 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other £10.25k £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £12.35k £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £718.77k £449.67k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £1.62k £1.18k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £3.18k £4.49k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A