Financial history FENLAND RIDING FOR THE DISABLED ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1074098
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £18.66k £390 £461 £6.08k £1.53k
Total expenditure £11.87k £2.77k £3.87k £3.13k £929
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A