AGE-2-AGE

Charity number: 1082361
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £14.79k £9.73k £17.26k £6.24k £10.44k
Total expenditure £16.10k £16.42k £15.53k £14.92k £19.74k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A