Financial history THE ST STEPHEN'S RESTORATION AND PRESERVATION TRUST

Charity number: 1075080
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £194.24k £235.42k £216.49k £101.65k £127.92k
Total expenditure £191.29k £194.24k £123.94k £94.32k £126.34k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A