Trustees GRIMSBY, CLEETHORPES AND DISTRICT CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU
Charity number: 1075288
Charity reporting is overdue by 88 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DARREN BILLARD | Chair | 16 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Ben Barber | Trustee | 10 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jane Bramley | Trustee | 07 January 2019 |
|
|||||
Peter Williams | Trustee | 10 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Gaynor Rogers | Trustee | 27 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN ALLINGHAM | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANN MAGGS MBE | Trustee |
|
||||||
GEORGE BAKER | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.