Financial history WOTTON-UNDER-EDGE AND DISTRICT ROUND TABLE NUMBER 974

Charity number: 1080029
Charity reporting is overdue by 81 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £15.94k £16.23k £14.07k £2.91k £8.74k
Total expenditure £17.38k £14.29k £14.35k £6.21k £3.10k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A