THE TULSI TRUST

Charity number: 1075298
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
harvey owen chuter Chair 02 January 2016
SRI RADHEY SEVA TRUST Received: On time
RUPERT ANDREWS Trustee None on record
Barbara Leonie Koller Trustee 16 October 2020 None on record
Dolfinn Ruby Star Brine-Andrews Trustee 10 December 2019 None on record
LUCY LORD Trustee 25 October 2016 None on record
MOIRA LYNCH Trustee 25 August 2017 None on record
SARAH MARGARET JESSIE DALTON Trustee None on record