Trustees THE FRIENDS OF THE CHURCH OF ST PETER AND ST PAUL, LAVENHAM
Charity number: 1076637
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Malcolm Linscott | Chair | 26 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
June Pamela Carole Linscott | Trustee | 02 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Lombers | Trustee | 04 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Charles Dinwiddy | Trustee | 04 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mary Jackson | Trustee | 15 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Marian Searle | Trustee | 28 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Julian E Baldwin | Trustee | 05 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
JANE ORBELL | Trustee | 17 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
MARY ALICIA WOLTON | Trustee | 30 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
IAN HARRY THOMPSON | Trustee | 12 March 2001 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.