AVERT

Charity number: 1074849
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £151.75k £165.00k £239.29k £236.89k £205.26k
Total expenditure £780.14k £841.03k £814.75k £770.14k £677.37k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A