ABERYSTWYTH BUSINESS CLUB/CLWB BUSNES ABERYSTWYTH

Charity number: 1078716
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £10.46k £9.92k £2.66k £4.00k £3.66k
Total expenditure £5.46k £7.91k £6.93k £6.25k £2.40k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A