REUNITE : INTERNATIONAL CHILD ABDUCTION CENTRE

Charity number: 1075729
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019
Total gross income £245.17k £253.06k £257.64k £249.05k £298.21k
Total expenditure £227.91k £244.17k £267.28k £267.44k £290.26k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £168.38k £171.19k £166.92k £168.00k £168.00k