Trustees West Yorkshire Community Accountancy Service CIO
Charity number: 1076962
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ian Richardson | Chair | 20 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Gary Gordon | Trustee | 29 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Richard Warrington | Trustee | 11 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Oden Makiwa | Trustee | 15 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca McCormick | Trustee | 15 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Helen Fahey | Trustee | 15 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lucillia Grayston | Trustee | 15 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Sagar | Trustee | 15 September 2021 |
|
|||||
Dipika Kaushal | Trustee | 19 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lydia Groenewald | Trustee | 09 October 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.